Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB72 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 72
1+By: White, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 72
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
3+ May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 72 By: Perry
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the provision of Medicaid benefits to certain children
614 formerly in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and
715 Protective Services.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 162.304(b-1), Family Code, is amended to
1018 read as follows:
1119 (b-1) Subject to the availability of funds, the department
1220 shall pay a $150 subsidy each month for the premiums for health
1321 benefits coverage for a child with respect to whom a court has
1422 entered a final order of adoption if the child:
1523 (1) was in the conservatorship of the department at
1624 the time of the child's adoptive placement;
1725 (2) after the adoption, is not receiving [eligible
1826 for] medical assistance under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code; and
1927 (3) is younger than 18 years of age.
2028 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
2129 amended by adding Section 533.00531 to read as follows:
2230 Sec. 533.00531. MEDICAID BENEFITS FOR CERTAIN CHILDREN
2331 FORMERLY IN FOSTER CARE. (a) This section applies only with
2432 respect to a child who:
2533 (1) resides in this state; and
2634 (2) is eligible for assistance or services under:
2735 (A) Subchapter D, Chapter 162, Family Code; or
2836 (B) Subchapter K, Chapter 264, Family Code.
2937 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the commission
3038 shall ensure that each child described by Subsection (a) remains or
3139 is enrolled in the STAR Health program unless or until the child is
3240 enrolled in another Medicaid managed care program.
3341 (c) If a child described by Subsection (a) received
3442 Supplemental Security Income (SSI) (42 U.S.C. Section 1381 et seq.)
3543 or was receiving Supplemental Security Income before becoming
3644 eligible for assistance or services under Subchapter D, Chapter
3745 162, Family Code, or Subchapter K, Chapter 264, Family Code, as
3846 applicable, the child may receive Medicaid benefits in accordance
3947 with the program established under this subsection. To the extent
4048 permitted by federal law, the commission, in consultation with the
4149 Department of Family and Protective Services, shall develop and
4250 implement a program that allows the adoptive parent or permanent
4351 managing conservator of a child described by this subsection to
4452 elect on behalf of the child to receive or, if applicable, continue
4553 receiving Medicaid benefits under the:
4654 (1) STAR Health program; or
4755 (2) STAR Kids managed care program.
4856 (d) The commission shall protect the continuity of care for
4957 each child described under this section and, if applicable, ensure
5058 coordination between the STAR Health program and any other Medicaid
5159 managed care program for each child who is transitioning between
5260 Medicaid managed care programs.
5361 (e) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
5462 to implement this section.
5563 SECTION 3. Section 162.304(f), Family Code, is repealed.
5664 SECTION 4. As soon as possible after the effective date of
5765 this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall apply for
5866 and actively pursue from the federal Centers for Medicare and
5967 Medicaid Services or other appropriate federal agency any waiver or
6068 other authorization necessary to implement Section 533.00531,
6169 Government Code, as added by this Act. The commission may delay
6270 implementing this Act until the waiver or authorization is granted.
6371 SECTION 5. The Health and Human Services Commission is
6472 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
6573 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
6674 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
6775 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
6876 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
6977 purpose.
7078 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
71- ______________________________ ______________________________
72- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
73- I certify that H.B. No. 72 was passed by the House on May 2,
74- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 2, 1 present, not
75- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
76- No. 72 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1
77- present, not voting.
78- ______________________________
79- Chief Clerk of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 72 was passed by the Senate, with
81- amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
82- 3.
83- ______________________________
84- Secretary of the Senate
85- APPROVED: __________________
86- Date
87- __________________
88- Governor
79+ * * * * *