Senate | 05/14/2019 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Record vote RV#1265 | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 01/10/2019 | Filed |