1 | | - | H.B. No. 76 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Huberty, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 76 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 4; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 76 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to cardiac assessments of high school participants in |
---|
6 | 14 | | extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the |
---|
7 | 15 | | University Interscholastic League. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended by adding Section 33.096 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 33.096. CARDIAC ASSESSMENTS OF HIGH SCHOOL |
---|
12 | 20 | | PARTICIPANTS IN EXTRACURRICULAR ATHLETIC ACTIVITIES. (a) A school |
---|
13 | 21 | | district must provide a district student, who is required under |
---|
14 | 22 | | University Interscholastic League rule or policy to receive a |
---|
15 | 23 | | physical examination before being allowed to participate in an |
---|
16 | 24 | | athletic activity sponsored or sanctioned by the University |
---|
17 | 25 | | Interscholastic League, the following: |
---|
18 | 26 | | (1) information about sudden cardiac arrest and |
---|
19 | 27 | | electrocardiogram testing; and |
---|
20 | 28 | | (2) notification of the option of the student to |
---|
21 | 29 | | request the administration of an electrocardiogram, in addition to |
---|
22 | 30 | | the physical examination. |
---|
23 | 31 | | (b) A student may request an electrocardiogram from any |
---|
24 | 32 | | health care professional, including a health care professional |
---|
25 | 33 | | provided through the student's patient-centered medical home, as |
---|
26 | 34 | | defined by Section 533.0029, Government Code, a health care |
---|
27 | 35 | | professional provided through a school district program, or another |
---|
28 | 36 | | health care professional chosen by the parent or person standing in |
---|
29 | 37 | | parental relation to the student, provided that the health care |
---|
30 | 38 | | professional is: |
---|
31 | 39 | | (1) appropriately licensed in this state; and |
---|
32 | 40 | | (2) authorized to administer and interpret |
---|
33 | 41 | | electrocardiograms under the health care professional's scope of |
---|
36 | 44 | | (c) The University Interscholastic League shall adopt rules |
---|
37 | 45 | | as necessary to administer this section. |
---|
38 | 46 | | (d) The rules adopted under Subsection (c) must include: |
---|
39 | 47 | | (1) criteria under which a school district may request |
---|
40 | 48 | | an exemption from the requirements of Subsection (a); |
---|
41 | 49 | | (2) variances that allow for a delay of the |
---|
42 | 50 | | implementation of the requirement to notify students of the option |
---|
43 | 51 | | to request an electrocardiogram under this section; |
---|
44 | 52 | | (3) procedures to ensure students receiving the |
---|
45 | 53 | | required annual physical examination are notified of the option to |
---|
46 | 54 | | request an electrocardiogram; and |
---|
47 | 55 | | (4) provisions to ensure that the requirements under |
---|
48 | 56 | | this section are minimum standards that provide a school district |
---|
49 | 57 | | with the option to implement a program that exceeds the standards |
---|
50 | 58 | | required by this section. |
---|
51 | 59 | | (e) This section does not create a cause of action or |
---|
52 | 60 | | liability or a standard of care, obligation, or duty that provides a |
---|
53 | 61 | | basis for a cause of action or liability against a health care |
---|
54 | 62 | | professional described by Subsection (b), the University |
---|
55 | 63 | | Interscholastic League, a school district, or a district officer or |
---|
56 | 64 | | employee for: |
---|
57 | 65 | | (1) the injury or death of a student participating in |
---|
58 | 66 | | or practicing for an athletic activity sponsored or sanctioned by |
---|
59 | 67 | | the University Interscholastic League based on or in connection |
---|
60 | 68 | | with the administration or interpretation of or reliance on an |
---|
61 | 69 | | electrocardiogram; or |
---|
62 | 70 | | (2) the content or distribution of the information |
---|
63 | 71 | | required under Subsection (a) or the failure to distribute the |
---|
64 | 72 | | required information under this section. |
---|
65 | 73 | | SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 |
---|
66 | 74 | | school year. |
---|
67 | 75 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
68 | 76 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
69 | 77 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
70 | 78 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
71 | 79 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
74 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 76 was passed by the House on March |
---|
75 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
76 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
77 | | - | No. 76 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
78 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
79 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
81 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 76 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
82 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 20, Nays |
---|
83 | | - | 11. |
---|
84 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
86 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
87 | | - | Date |
---|
88 | | - | __________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 80 | + | * * * * * |
---|