Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019