Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019