Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB87 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/08/2019

                    By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 87
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019;
 April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided to minors during the driver's
 license application process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.145(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall provide the applicant and the
 cosigner with information concerning state laws relating to
 distracted driving, driving while intoxicated, driving by a minor
 with alcohol in the minor's system, and implied consent. The
 applicant and cosigner must acknowledge receipt of this
 information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *