1 | | - | H.B. No. 871 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 871 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to use of telemedicine medical service by certain trauma |
---|
6 | 12 | | facilities. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1151 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 773.1151. USE OF TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL SERVICE BY |
---|
11 | 17 | | CERTAIN TRAUMA FACILITIES. (a) In this section, "telemedicine |
---|
12 | 18 | | medical service" has the meaning assigned by Section 111.001, |
---|
13 | 19 | | Occupations Code. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (b) A health care facility located in a county with a |
---|
15 | 21 | | population of less than 30,000 may satisfy a Level IV trauma |
---|
16 | 22 | | facility designation requirement relating to physicians through |
---|
17 | 23 | | the use of telemedicine medical service in which an on-call |
---|
18 | 24 | | physician who has special competence in the care of critically |
---|
19 | 25 | | injured patients provides patient assessment, diagnosis, |
---|
20 | 26 | | consultation, or treatment or transfers medical data to a |
---|
21 | 27 | | physician, advanced practice registered nurse, or physician |
---|
22 | 28 | | assistant located at the facility. |
---|
23 | 29 | | (c) In establishing the requirements for designating a |
---|
24 | 30 | | facility as a Level IV trauma facility, the executive commissioner |
---|
25 | 31 | | may not adopt rules that: |
---|
26 | 32 | | (1) require the physical presence or physical |
---|
27 | 33 | | availability of a physician who has special competence in the care |
---|
28 | 34 | | of critically injured patients; or |
---|
29 | 35 | | (2) prohibit the use of telemedicine medical service |
---|
30 | 36 | | that meets the requirements of Subsection (b). |
---|
31 | 37 | | SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and |
---|
32 | 38 | | Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section |
---|
33 | 39 | | 773.1151, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later |
---|
34 | 40 | | than December 1, 2019. |
---|
35 | 41 | | SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 773.1151, Health and |
---|
36 | 42 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act, a health care facility located in |
---|
37 | 43 | | a county with a population of less than 30,000 may use telemedicine |
---|
38 | 44 | | medical service to satisfy a Level IV trauma facility designation |
---|
39 | 45 | | requirement only on or after January 1, 2020. |
---|
40 | 46 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 871 was passed by the House on April |
---|
44 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 871 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
49 | | - | 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
52 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Date |
---|
54 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|