Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB872 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 872
1+By: Hefner, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Flores, Lucio) H.B. No. 872
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 872 By: Huffman
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to financial assistance paid to the survivors of certain
614 law enforcement officers and other public employees killed in the
715 line of duty.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 615.041, Government Code, is amended to
1018 read as follows:
1119 Sec. 615.041. CONSIDERATION AND DETERMINATION [PROOF] OF
1220 CLAIM; COMPELLED COMPLIANCE. (a) Not later than the 30th day [As
1321 soon as practicable] after the date of the death of an individual
1422 listed under Section 615.003 that occurs in the performance of
1523 duties in the individual's position as described by Section 615.003
1624 or as a result of an action that occurs while the individual is
1725 performing those duties [is claimed to meet the requirements of
1826 Section 615.021(1)], the individual's employing entity shall
1927 furnish to the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System
2028 of Texas proof of the death in the form and with additional evidence
21- and informat
22- ion required by the board. The employing entity shall
29+ and information required by the board. The employing entity shall
2330 furnish the evidence and information required under this subsection
2431 regardless of whether the employing entity believes the
2532 individual's death satisfies the eligibility requirements
2633 established under Section 615.021(a)(1).
2734 (b) The board of trustees shall consider the proof,
2835 evidence, and information provided under Subsection (a), and any
2936 additional information required by the rules adopted in accordance
3037 with Section 615.002, to determine whether the individual's death
3138 satisfies the eligibility requirements established under Section
3239 615.021(a)(1) and justifies the payment of assistance to the
3340 individual's eligible survivors under this chapter.
3441 (c) If the individual's employing entity fails to comply
3542 with Subsection (a), the attorney general may use any means
3643 authorized by law, including filing suit for a writ of mandamus
3744 against the employer, to compel the employer's compliance with this
3845 section.
3946 SECTION 2. Section 615.121(a), Government Code, is amended
4047 to read as follows:
4148 (a) The state shall pay the following benefits to an
4249 eligible surviving spouse of a peace officer, a jailer, a county
4350 jailer or guard, or an employee of the Texas Department of Criminal
4451 Justice, as described by Section 615.003(1), (4), [or] (6), or (7),
4552 who was killed in the line of duty and who had not qualified for an
4653 annuity under an employees' retirement plan:
4754 (1) funeral expenses related to the deceased person
4855 [officer or employee]; and
4956 (2) monthly payments that equal the greater of:
5057 (A) the monthly annuity payment the deceased
5158 person [officer or employee] would have received if the deceased
5259 person [officer or employee] had survived, had retired on the last
5360 day of the month in which the person [officer or employee] died, and
5461 had been eligible to receive an annuity under an employees'
5562 retirement plan; or
5663 (B) the minimum monthly annuity payment the
5764 deceased person [officer or employee] would have received if the
5865 person [officer or employee] had been employed by the state for 10
5966 years, had been paid a salary at the lowest amount provided by the
6067 General Appropriations Act for a position of peace officer, jailer,
6168 county jailer or guard, or employee of the Texas Department of
6269 Criminal Justice, as described by Section 615.003(1), (4), [or]
6370 (6), or (7), and had been eligible to retire under the Employees
6471 Retirement System of Texas.
6572 SECTION 3. Section 615.041, Government Code, as amended by
6673 this Act, applies to the payment of assistance in connection with a
6774 death that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. The
6875 payment of assistance in connection with a death that occurs before
6976 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
7077 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
7178 continued in effect for that purpose.
7279 SECTION 4. Section 615.121(a), Government Code, as amended
7380 by this Act, applies to a payment of assistance to survivors of
7481 certain law enforcement officers and employees on or after the
7582 effective date of this Act regardless of the date the officer or
7683 employee died.
7784 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
78- ______________________________ ______________________________
79- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 872 was passed by the House on April
81- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 3, 1 present, not
82- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
83- No. 872 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 4, 1
84- present, not voting.
85- ______________________________
86- Chief Clerk of the House
87- I certify that H.B. No. 872 was passed by the Senate, with
88- amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
89- 0.
90- ______________________________
91- Secretary of the Senate
92- APPROVED: __________________
93- Date
94- __________________
95- Governor
85+ * * * * *