Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB907 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 907
1+By: Huberty (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 907
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
4+ Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported
5+ adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
6+ vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 907 By: Powell
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the regulation of aggregate production operations by
614 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; increasing a fee;
715 increasing administrative penalties.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 28A.053, Water Code, is amended to read
1018 as follows:
1119 Sec. 28A.053. INSPECTION. (a) The commission shall
1220 inspect each active aggregate production operation in this state
1321 for compliance with applicable environmental laws and rules under
1422 the jurisdiction of the commission:
1523 (1) at least once every two [three] years during the
1624 first six years in which the operation is registered; and
1725 (2) after the expiration of the period described by
1826 Subdivision (1), at least once every three years.
1927 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
2028 commission may conduct an inspection only after providing notice to
2129 the responsible party in accordance with commission policy.
2230 (c) The commission may conduct unannounced periodic
2331 inspections under this section of an aggregate production operation
2432 that in the preceding three-year period has been issued a notice of
2533 violation by the commission for a violation of an environmental law
2634 or rule under the jurisdiction of the commission. The unannounced
2735 inspections may be conducted only for a period of not more than one
2836 year.
2937 (d) An [Except as provided by Subsection (d), an] inspection
3038 must be conducted by one or more inspectors trained in the
3139 regulatory requirements [under the jurisdiction of the commission
3240 that are] applicable to [an] active aggregate production operations
3341 under the jurisdiction of the commission [operation]. If the
3442 inspection is conducted by more than one inspector, each inspector
3543 is not required to be trained in each of the applicable regulatory
3644 requirements, but the combined training of the inspectors must
3745 include each of the applicable regulatory requirements. The
3846 applicable regulatory requirements include requirements related
3947 to:
4048 (1) individual water quality permits issued under
4149 Section 26.027;
4250 (2) a general water quality permit issued under
4351 Section 26.040;
4452 (3) air quality permits issued under Section 382.051,
4553 Health and Safety Code; and
4654 (4) other regulatory requirements applicable to
4755 active aggregate production operations under the jurisdiction of
4856 the commission.
4957 (e) [(d)] An investigation in response to a complaint
5058 satisfies the requirement of an inspection under this section if a
5159 potential noncompliance issue not related to the complaint is
5260 observed and is:
5361 (1) not within an area of expertise of the
5462 investigator but is referred by the investigator to the commission
5563 for further investigation; or
5664 (2) within an area of expertise of the inspector and is
5765 appropriately investigated and appropriately addressed in the
5866 investigation report.
5967 SECTION 2. Section 28A.101(b), Water Code, is amended to
6068 read as follows:
6169 (b) The commission shall set the annual registration fee in
6270 an amount sufficient to maintain a registry of active aggregate
6371 production operations in this state and implement this chapter, not
6472 to exceed $1,500 [$1,000].
6573 SECTION 3. Section 28A.102, Water Code, is amended to read
6674 as follows:
6775 Sec. 28A.102. PENALTY. The commission may assess a penalty
6876 of not less than $5,000 and not more than $20,000 [$10,000] for each
6977 year in which an aggregate production operation operates without
7078 being registered under this chapter. The total penalty under this
7179 section may not exceed $40,000 [$25,000] for an aggregate
7280 production operation that is operated in three or more years
7381 without being registered.
7482 SECTION 4. Section 28A.102, Water Code, as amended by this
7583 Act, applies only to a penalty assessed on or after the effective
7684 date of this Act. A penalty assessed before the effective date of
7785 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the penalty was
7886 assessed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
7987 purpose.
8088 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
81- ______________________________ ______________________________
82- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
83- I certify that H.B. No. 907 was passed by the House on May 10,
84- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 13, 1 present, not
85- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
86- No. 907 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 8, 1
87- present, not voting.
88- ______________________________
89- Chief Clerk of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 907 was passed by the Senate, with
91- amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
92- 3.
93- ______________________________
94- Secretary of the Senate
95- APPROVED: __________________
96- Date
97- __________________
98- Governor
89+ * * * * *