House | 04/17/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/17/2019 | Filed |