Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB914 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019