Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB933 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019