Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB963 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 963
1+By: Bell of Montgomery, et al. H.B. No. 963
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Taylor)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
4+ May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
7+ May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 963 By: Taylor
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
5- relating to the availability of school district trustee information
6- on the Internet and a review of the essential knowledge and skills
7- of certain curricula.
14+ relating to a review by the State Board of Education of the
15+ essential knowledge and skills of the career and technology and
16+ technology applications curriculums.
817 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
9- SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
10- amended by adding Section 11.1518 to read as follows:
11- Sec. 11.1518. TRUSTEE INFORMATION POSTED ON WEBSITE. (a)
12- Each school district that maintains an Internet website shall post
13- on the website the name, e-mail address, and term of office,
14- including the date the term began and the date the term expires, of
15- each member of the district's board of trustees.
16- (b) If a school district does not maintain an Internet
17- website, the district shall submit the information required by
18- Subsection (a) to the agency. On receipt of the district's
19- information, the agency shall post the information on the agency's
20- Internet website.
21- (c) Each time there is a change in the membership of a school
22- district's board of trustees, the district shall update the
23- information required under Subsection (a) and, as applicable:
24- (1) post the updated information on the district's
25- Internet website; or
26- (2) submit the updated information to the agency for
27- posting on the agency's Internet website in accordance with
28- Subsection (b).
29- SECTION 2. Not later than March 1, 2020, the State Board of
18+ SECTION 1. Not later than March 1, 2020, the State Board of
3019 Education shall:
3120 (1) conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
3221 skills of the career and technology and technology applications
33- curricula; and
22+ curriculums; and
3423 (2) amend the board's rules in the Texas
3524 Administrative Code to consolidate the technology applications
3625 courses for grades 9 through 12 in 19 T.A.C. Chapter 126, Subchapter
3726 C, with the career and technical education courses in 19 T.A.C.
3827 Chapter 130, and eliminate duplicative courses while ensuring
3928 certifications are aligned with the rigor of each individual
4029 course.
41- SECTION 3. The State Board of Education is required to
30+ SECTION 2. The State Board of Education is required to
4231 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
4332 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
4433 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
4534 purpose, the State Board of Education may, but is not required to,
4635 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
4736 available for that purpose.
48- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
37+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
4938 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5039 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5140 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5241 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
53- ______________________________ ______________________________
54- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
55- I certify that H.B. No. 963 was passed by the House on May 2,
56- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 3, 1 present, not
57- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
58- No. 963 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 18,
59- 1 present, not voting.
60- ______________________________
61- Chief Clerk of the House
62- I certify that H.B. No. 963 was passed by the Senate, with
63- amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
64- 0.
65- ______________________________
66- Secretary of the Senate
67- APPROVED: __________________
68- Date
69- __________________
70- Governor
42+ * * * * *