Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB97 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 05/01/2019

                            By: Rodriguez, Murphy, Guillen, Zwiener H.B. No. 97


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of land for appraisal for ad valorem tax
 purposes as qualified open-space land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 23.51(1) and (2), Tax Code, are amended
 to read as follows:
 (1)  "Qualified open-space land" means land that is
 currently devoted principally to agricultural use to the degree of
 intensity generally accepted in the area and that has been devoted
 principally to agricultural use or to production of timber or
 forest products for five of the preceding seven years or land that
 is used principally as an ecological laboratory by a public or
 private college or university and that has been used principally in
 that manner by a college or university for five of the preceding
 seven years. A chief appraiser shall distinguish between the
 degree of intensity required for various agricultural production
 methods, including organic, sustainable, pastured poultry,
 rotational grazing, and other uncommon production methods or
 systems.  Qualified open-space land includes all appurtenances to
 the land.  For the purposes of this subdivision, appurtenances to
 the land means private roads, dams, reservoirs, water wells,
 canals, ditches, terraces, and other reshapings of the soil,
 fences, and riparian water rights.  Notwithstanding the other
 provisions of this subdivision, land that is currently devoted
 principally to wildlife management as defined by Subdivision (7)(B)
 or (C) to the degree of intensity generally accepted in the area
 qualifies for appraisal as qualified open-space land under this
 subchapter regardless of the manner in which the land was used in
 any preceding year.
 (2)  "Agricultural use" includes but is not limited to
 the following activities:  cultivating the soil, producing crops
 for human food, animal feed, or planting seed or for the production
 of fibers; producing fruits and vegetables; floriculture,
 viticulture, and horticulture; raising or keeping livestock;
 raising or keeping exotic animals for the production of human food
 or of fiber, leather, pelts, or other tangible products having a
 commercial value; planting cover crops or leaving land idle for the
 purpose of participating in a governmental program, provided the
 land is not used for residential purposes or a purpose inconsistent
 with agricultural use; and planting cover crops or leaving land
 idle in conjunction with normal crop or livestock rotation
 procedure.  The term also includes the use of land to produce or
 harvest logs and posts for the use in constructing or repairing
 fences, pens, barns, or other agricultural improvements on adjacent
 qualified open-space land having the same owner and devoted to a
 different agricultural use.  The term also includes the use of land
 for wildlife management.  The term also includes the use of land to
 raise or keep bees for pollination or for the production of human
 food or other tangible products having a commercial value, provided
 that the land used is not less than 5 or more than 20 acres.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.5211 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.5211.  LIMITATION ON QUALIFICATION OF CERTAIN LAND
 FOR APPRAISAL BASED ON WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT USE. Land equal to or
 less than 20 acres in size that qualifies for appraisal under this
 subchapter solely on the basis that the land is used to raise or
 keep bees for pollination or for the production of human food or
 other tangible products having a commercial value may not
 subsequently qualify under Section 23.51(7) for appraisal under
 this subchapter if the owner changes the use of the land to wildlife
 management.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.5215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.5215.  GUIDELINES FOR UNCOMMON AGRICULTURAL USES.
 (a) The comptroller, in consultation with the chair of the house of
 representatives committee on agriculture and livestock, Texas A&M
 AgriLife Extension Service, individuals selected by the
 comptroller who represent appraisal districts, and individuals
 selected by the comptroller who represent affected producers, shall
 develop guidelines for determining under what conditions the
 cumulative effect of multiple agricultural uses of a tract of land
 meets the degree of intensity generally accepted in the area.
 (b)  The comptroller, in consultation with the chair of the
 house of representatives committee on agriculture and livestock,
 Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, individuals selected by the
 comptroller who represent appraisal districts, and individuals
 selected by the comptroller who represent small-scale producers,
 shall develop guidelines for determining under what conditions land
 under 10 acres in size used for the production of fruits,
 vegetables, poultry, hogs, sheep, or goats qualifies for appraisal
 under this subchapter.  The guidelines must provide that land under
 10 acres in size that qualifies for appraisal under this subchapter
 solely on the basis of the guidelines developed under this section
 may not subsequently qualify under Section 23.51(7) for appraisal
 under this subchapter if the owner changes the use of the land to
 wildlife management.
 (c)  The guidelines developed under this section may include
 recordkeeping requirements consistent with normal practices of
 agricultural operations.
 (d)  The comptroller in developing guidelines under this
 section may consider the following factors:
 (1)  the financial investment of a producer in an
 agricultural use of a tract of land;
 (2)  the degree of active management of a producer in
 the agricultural use of a tract of land;
 (3)  the percentage of a tract of land used by a
 producer for agricultural uses; and
 (4)  any other factor the comptroller considers
 appropriate.
 (e)  The comptroller, in cooperation with appraisal
 districts, shall provide educational resources to chief appraisers
 to assist with the appraisal of land using the guidelines developed
 under this section and of land using an uncommon production method,
 such as organic production, sustainable production, and pastured
 poultry.
 SECTION 4.  This section applies only to land that first
 qualified for appraisal under Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code,
 on the basis of its use as an ecological laboratory in the 2014,
 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, or 2020 tax year. The change in law
 made by this Act to Section 23.51(1), Tax Code, relating to the
 qualification of land as an ecological laboratory for appraisal
 under Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, applies to land to which
 this section applies beginning with the tax year that begins
 January 1, 2027. For the 2021, 2022, 2023, 2024, 2025, and 2026 tax
 years, the qualification of land to which this section applies for
 appraisal under Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, on the basis of
 its use as an ecological laboratory is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  Section 23.5211, Tax Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to land that did not qualify for appraisal under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code, for the 2019 tax year on the
 basis of its use for wildlife management under Section 23.51(7),
 Tax Code.
 SECTION 6.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the
 comptroller shall distribute the guidelines required by Section
 23.5215, Tax Code, as added by this Act, to each appraisal district.
 SECTION 7.  Section 23.51, Tax Code, as amended by this Act,
 and Section 23.5215, Tax Code, as added by this Act, apply only to
 the appraisal of land for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year
 that begins on or after January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.