Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019