Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB98 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019