4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to appeals to justice courts of certain ad valorem tax |
---|
6 | 14 | | determinations. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 42, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
9 | 17 | | Subchapter B-1 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | SUBCHAPTER B-1. APPEALS FROM APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD DETERMINATIONS |
---|
11 | 19 | | IN CERTAIN COUNTIES |
---|
12 | 20 | | Sec. 42.35. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
13 | 21 | | applies only to the appeal of an order issued by an appraisal review |
---|
14 | 22 | | board that is located in a county: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) that has a population of less than 45,500; |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) that shares a border with a county that has a |
---|
17 | 25 | | population of 1.5 million or more and is within 200 miles of an |
---|
18 | 26 | | international border; and |
---|
19 | 27 | | (3) through which the Atascosa River flows. |
---|
20 | 28 | | Sec. 42.36. APPEALS TO JUSTICE COURT. (a) As an |
---|
21 | 29 | | alternative to bringing an appeal under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a |
---|
22 | 30 | | district court as provided by Subchapter B, a property owner may |
---|
23 | 31 | | bring the appeal to a justice court if: |
---|
24 | 32 | | (1) the appeal relates only to a claim of excessive |
---|
25 | 33 | | appraisal of property that qualifies as the owner's residence |
---|
26 | 34 | | homestead; and |
---|
27 | 35 | | (2) the appraised value of the property as determined |
---|
28 | 36 | | by the appraisal review board and stated in the order being appealed |
---|
29 | 37 | | is $500,000 or less. |
---|
30 | 38 | | (b) Venue of an action brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) in |
---|
31 | 39 | | justice court is in any justice precinct in which the property that |
---|
32 | 40 | | is the subject of the order being appealed is located. |
---|
33 | 41 | | (c) If the justice court determines that the justice court |
---|
34 | 42 | | does not have jurisdiction of the appeal, the court shall dismiss |
---|
35 | 43 | | the appeal. In that event, the property owner may appeal the order |
---|
36 | 44 | | to a district court by filing a petition for review with the |
---|
37 | 45 | | district court not later than the 30th day after the date of the |
---|
38 | 46 | | dismissal. |
---|
39 | 47 | | (d) Sections 42.21, 42.23, 42.24, and 42.25 apply to an |
---|
40 | 48 | | appeal brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court in the |
---|
41 | 49 | | same manner as those sections apply to an appeal brought under |
---|
42 | 50 | | Section 42.01(a)(1) to a district court. |
---|
43 | 51 | | Sec. 42.37. REPRESENTATION IN JUSTICE COURT. In an appeal |
---|
44 | 52 | | brought under Section 42.01(a)(1) to a justice court, an appraisal |
---|
45 | 53 | | district may be, but is not required to be, represented by legal |
---|
46 | 54 | | counsel. |
---|
47 | 55 | | Sec. 42.38. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter |
---|
48 | 56 | | expires September 1, 2025. |
---|
49 | 57 | | SECTION 2. On the expiration of Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, |
---|
50 | 58 | | Tax Code, as added by this Act, the Office of Court Administration |
---|
51 | 59 | | of the Texas Judicial System, using existing resources, shall |
---|
52 | 60 | | conduct a study on that subchapter's effectiveness in increasing |
---|
53 | 61 | | court efficiency and improving property owners' ability to exercise |
---|
54 | 62 | | their appeal rights under Chapter 42, Tax Code. Not later than |
---|
55 | 63 | | December 1, 2026, the office shall issue a report on the study to |
---|
56 | 64 | | the appropriate standing committees of the house of representatives |
---|
57 | 65 | | and the senate. The report must include the office's |
---|
58 | 66 | | recommendation as to whether the legislature, in the next regular |
---|
59 | 67 | | legislative session following the issuance of the report, should |
---|
60 | 68 | | enact legislation similar to Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax Code, |
---|
61 | 69 | | as added by this Act. |
---|
62 | 70 | | SECTION 3. An appeal under Subchapter B-1, Chapter 42, Tax |
---|
63 | 71 | | Code, as added by this Act, that is pending on September 1, 2025, is |
---|
64 | 72 | | governed by that subchapter as it existed on August 31, 2025, and |
---|
65 | 73 | | that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
66 | 74 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies to the |
---|
67 | 75 | | appeal of an order of an appraisal review board without regard to |
---|
68 | 76 | | whether the order was issued before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
69 | 77 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
70 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
71 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
72 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 994 was passed by the House on April |
---|
73 | | - | 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 8, 2 present, not |
---|
74 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
75 | | - | No. 994 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
76 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
77 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 994 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
80 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
81 | | - | 0. |
---|
82 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
84 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
85 | | - | Date |
---|
86 | | - | __________________ |
---|
87 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 78 | + | * * * * * |
---|