Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB996 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 996
1+By: Collier, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 996
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with
5+ favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
6+ Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 996 By: Paxton
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the collection of consumer debt by debt buyers.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Fair Consumer Debt
816 Collection Act.
917 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 392, Finance Code, is
1018 amended by adding Section 392.307 to read as follows:
1119 Sec. 392.307. COLLECTION OF CERTAIN CONSUMER DEBT BY DEBT
1220 BUYERS. (a) In this section:
1321 (1) "Charged-off debt" means a consumer debt that a
1422 creditor has determined to be a loss or expense to the creditor
1523 instead of an asset.
1624 (2) "Debt buyer" means a person who purchases or
1725 otherwise acquires a consumer debt from a creditor or other
1826 subsequent owner of the consumer debt, regardless of whether the
1927 person collects the consumer debt, hires a third party to collect
2028 the consumer debt, or hires an attorney to pursue collection
2129 litigation in connection with the consumer debt. The term does not
2230 include:
2331 (A) a person who acquires in-default or
2432 charged-off debt that is incidental to the purchase of a portfolio
2533 that predominantly consists of consumer debt that has not been
2634 charged off; or
2735 (B) a check services company that acquires the
2836 right to collect on a paper or electronic negotiable instrument,
2937 including an Automated Clearing House (ACH) authorization to debit
3038 an account that has not been processed.
3139 (b) Unless otherwise expressly provided, this section
3240 prevails to the extent of any conflict between this section and any
3341 other law of this state.
3442 (c) A debt buyer may not, directly or indirectly, commence
3543 an action against or initiate arbitration with a consumer to
3644 collect a consumer debt after the expiration of the applicable
3745 limitations period provided by Section 16.004, Civil Practice and
3846 Remedies Code, or Section 3.118, Business & Commerce Code.
3947 (d) If an action to collect a consumer debt is barred under
4048 Subsection (c), the cause of action is not revived by a payment of
4149 the consumer debt, an oral or written reaffirmation of the consumer
4250 debt, or any other activity on the consumer debt.
4351 (e) If a debt buyer is engaged in debt collection for a
4452 consumer debt for which an action to collect the debt is barred
4553 under Subsection (c), the debt buyer, or a debt collector acting on
4654 behalf of the debt buyer, shall provide the following notice in the
4755 initial written communication with the consumer relating to the
4856 debt collection:
4957 (1) if the reporting period for including the consumer
5058 debt in a consumer report prepared by a consumer reporting agency
5159 has not expired under Section 605, Fair Credit Reporting Act (15
5260 U.S.C. Section 1681c), and the debt buyer furnishes to a consumer
5361 reporting agency information regarding the consumer debt, "THE LAW
5462 LIMITS HOW LONG YOU CAN BE SUED ON A DEBT. BECAUSE OF THE AGE OF
5563 YOUR DEBT, WE WILL NOT SUE YOU FOR IT. IF YOU DO NOT PAY THE DEBT,
5664 [INSERT NAME OF DEBT BUYER] MAY CONTINUE TO REPORT IT TO CREDIT
5765 REPORTING AGENCIES AS UNPAID FOR AS LONG AS THE LAW PERMITS THIS
5866 REPORTING. THIS NOTICE IS REQUIRED BY LAW.";
5967 (2) if the reporting period for including the consumer
6068 debt in a consumer report prepared by a consumer reporting agency
6169 has not expired under Section 605, Fair Credit Reporting Act (15
6270 U.S.C. Section 1681c), but the debt buyer does not furnish to a
6371 consumer reporting agency information regarding the consumer debt,
6472 "THE LAW LIMITS HOW LONG YOU CAN BE SUED ON A DEBT. BECAUSE OF THE
6573 AGE OF YOUR DEBT, WE WILL NOT SUE YOU FOR IT. THIS NOTICE IS
6674 REQUIRED BY LAW."; or
6775 (3) if the reporting period for including the consumer
6876 debt in a consumer report prepared by a consumer reporting agency
6977 has expired under Section 605, Fair Credit Reporting Act (15 U.S.C.
7078 Section 1681c), "THE LAW LIMITS HOW LONG YOU CAN BE SUED ON A DEBT.
7179 BECAUSE OF THE AGE OF YOUR DEBT, WE WILL NOT SUE YOU FOR IT, AND WE
7280 WILL NOT REPORT IT TO ANY CREDIT REPORTING AGENCY. THIS NOTICE IS
7381 REQUIRED BY LAW."
7482 (f) A notice required under Subsection (e) must be in at
7583 least 12-point type that is boldfaced, capitalized, or underlined
7684 or otherwise conspicuously set out from the surrounding written
7785 material.
7886 SECTION 3. Section 392.402, Finance Code, is amended by
7987 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
8088 follows:
8189 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (d), a [A] person
8290 commits an offense if the person violates this chapter.
8391 (d) This section does not apply to a violation of Section
8492 392.307.
8593 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
8694 an action of a debt buyer to collect a consumer debt if the action
8795 occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. An action of a
8896 debt buyer to collect a consumer debt that occurs before the
8997 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
9098 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
9199 effect for that purpose.
92100 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
93- ______________________________ ______________________________
94- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
95- I certify that H.B. No. 996 was passed by the House on April
96- 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 20, 3 present, not
97- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
98- No. 996 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 7, 2
99- present, not voting.
100- ______________________________
101- Chief Clerk of the House
102- I certify that H.B. No. 996 was passed by the Senate, with
103- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
104- 0.
105- ______________________________
106- Secretary of the Senate
107- APPROVED: __________________
108- Date
109- __________________
110- Governor
101+ * * * * *