Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR164 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/23/2019

                            86R20016 JGH-D
 By: Wray H.C.R. No. 164


 CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Texas Legislative Medal of Honor was established
 to recognize gallant and intrepid service by a member of the state
 or federal military forces, and U.S. Marine Corps First Lieutenant
 Andrew Jackson Lummus Jr., who was killed in action in the Battle of
 Iwo Jima during World War II, proved himself a deserving recipient
 of this prestigious award; and
 WHEREAS, Jack Lummus was born in Ennis on October 22, 1915,
 and he grew up on his family's cotton farm during the Great
 Depression; a gifted athlete, he earned scholarships to Texas
 Military College and to Baylor University, where he played baseball
 and football for the Bears; in early 1941, he left college to enlist
 in the U.S. Army Air Corps but was given an honorable discharge when
 he failed to complete flight school; he then accepted an offer to
 play professional football with the New York Giants, and it was
 during the team's game on December 7, 1941, that he learned of the
 attack on Pearl Harbor; determined to serve his country, he
 enlisted in the U.S. Marine Corps, and after a series of training
 and duty assignments in the United States, he was deployed to the
 Pacific theater as an officer in the 2nd Battalion, 27th Marines,
 5th Marine Division; and
 WHEREAS, Lieutenant Lummus led his rifle platoon ashore at
 Iwo Jima as part of the initial contingent of marine forces to land
 on the island; on March 8, 1945, his unit advanced against a line of
 Japanese pillboxes along the island's rugged Nishi Ridge; moving
 ahead of his men under fierce enemy fire, he destroyed one pillbox
 with grenades even as he was wounded and knocked off his feet by a
 blast from an enemy grenade; undaunted, he eliminated a second
 pillbox and returned to his platoon before attacking and knocking
 out a third pillbox; he urged his fellow marines forward while
 continuing to fire into enemy foxholes with his carbine; and
 WHEREAS, This courageous Texan's one-man assault was ended
 when he stepped on a land mine; though he lost both of his legs in
 the explosion, he continued to shout to his men, "Don't stop now!
 Keep going!" and by nightfall, his unit had taken the ridge;
 Lieutenant Lummus died on the operating table in a field hospital
 and was buried in the Fifth Marine Division cemetery on the island;
 and
 WHEREAS, On May 30, 1946, First Lieutenant Jack Lummus was
 posthumously honored with the Medal of Honor, the nation's highest
 commendation for valor in combat, by President Harry S. Truman, and
 two years later, he was reinterred in his hometown cemetery; in the
 decades since, his heroism has been recognized many times; in 1986,
 the U.S. Navy named a ship after him, and that same year, Jack
 Lummus Memorial Park was dedicated in Ennis, where there is also an
 intermediate school that bears his name; his Medal of Honor
 citation is on display at Baylor University, and on October 11,
 2015, the New York Giants inducted him into the Ring of Honor at
 MetLife Stadium; and
 WHEREAS, During one of the most savage battles of World War
 II, First Lieutenant Jack Lummus demonstrated extraordinary
 bravery and leadership and made the ultimate sacrifice while
 defending our nation, and he is indeed deserving of this state's
 supreme military commendation; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby direct the governor of the State of Texas to posthumously
 award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to Andrew Jackson Lummus
 Jr. in recognition of his valiant service during World War II.