Senate | 05/22/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Record vote RV#1606 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Filed |