06/14/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/28/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/26/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Filed |