Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019