06/07/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/24/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/21/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Record vote RV#748 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 01/24/2019 | Filed |