|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Record vote RV#511
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to House Administration
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|