Senate | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Record vote RV#162 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 01/30/2019 | Filed |