02/20/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
02/13/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/30/2019 | Filed |