Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019