Senate | 04/29/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Record vote RV#550 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Amended 1-G. Bonnen | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed |