Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR151 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2019

                    By: Huberty (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.J.R. No. 151
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2019;
 May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment allowing increased
 distributions to the available school fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5(g), Article VII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 constitution or of a statute, the State Board of Education, the
 General Land Office, or another [an] entity [other than the State
 Board of Education] that has responsibility for the management of
 revenues derived from permanent school fund land or other
 properties may, in its sole discretion and in addition to other
 distributions authorized under this constitution or a statute,
 distribute to the available school fund each year revenue derived
 during that year from the land or properties, not to exceed $600
 [$300] million by each entity each year.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment allowing increased
 distributions to the available school fund."
 * * * * *