House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2019 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 02/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/19/2018 | Filed |