Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR34 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2019

                    H.J.R. No. 34


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a
 portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a
 disaster.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The Legislature by general law may provide that a person
 who owns property located in an area declared by the governor to be
 a disaster area following a disaster is entitled to a temporary
 exemption from ad valorem taxation by a political subdivision of a
 portion of the appraised value of that property.  The general law
 may provide that if the governor first declares territory in the
 political subdivision to be a disaster area as a result of a
 disaster on or after the date the political subdivision adopts a tax
 rate for the tax year in which the declaration is issued, a person
 is entitled to the exemption authorized by this subsection for that
 tax year only if the exemption is adopted by the governing body of
 the political subdivision. The Legislature by general law may
 prescribe the method of determining the amount of the exemption
 authorized by this subsection and the duration of the exemption and
 may provide additional eligibility requirements for the exemption.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property
 damaged by a disaster."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.J.R. No. 34 was passed by the House on April
 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.J.R. No. 34 on May 23, 2019, by a non-record vote and requested
 the appointment of a conference committee to consider the
 differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the
 conference committee report on H.J.R. No. 34 on May 26, 2019, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 1, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.J.R. No. 34 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.J.R.
 No. 34 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 RECEIVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Secretary of State