1 | | - | H.J.R. No. 34 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Shine, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.J.R. No. 34 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Property |
---|
| 4 | + | Tax; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 5 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, |
---|
| 6 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 34 By: Bettencourt |
---|
5 | 12 | | proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature |
---|
6 | 13 | | to provide for a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of a |
---|
7 | 14 | | portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a |
---|
8 | 15 | | disaster. |
---|
9 | 16 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 2, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is |
---|
11 | 18 | | amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 19 | | (e) The Legislature by general law may provide that a person |
---|
13 | 20 | | who owns property located in an area declared by the governor to be |
---|
14 | 21 | | a disaster area following a disaster is entitled to a temporary |
---|
15 | 22 | | exemption from ad valorem taxation by a political subdivision of a |
---|
16 | | - | portion of the appraised value of that property. The general law |
---|
17 | | - | may provide that if the governor first declares territory in the |
---|
18 | | - | political subdivision to be a disaster area as a result of a |
---|
19 | | - | disaster on or after the date the political subdivision adopts a tax |
---|
20 | | - | rate for the tax year in which the declaration is issued, a person |
---|
21 | | - | is entitled to the exemption authorized by this subsection for that |
---|
22 | | - | tax year only if the exemption is adopted by the governing body of |
---|
23 | | - | the political subdivision. The Legislature by general law may |
---|
24 | | - | prescribe the method of determining the amount of the exemption |
---|
25 | | - | authorized by this subsection and the duration of the exemption and |
---|
26 | | - | may provide additional eligibility requirements for the exemption. |
---|
| 23 | + | portion of the appraised value of that property. The Legislature by |
---|
| 24 | + | general law may prescribe the method of determining the amount of |
---|
| 25 | + | the exemption authorized by this subsection and the duration of the |
---|
| 26 | + | exemption and may provide additional eligibility requirements for |
---|
| 27 | + | the exemption. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 34 was passed by the House on April |
---|
37 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
39 | | - | H.J.R. No. 34 on May 23, 2019, by a non-record vote and requested |
---|
40 | | - | the appointment of a conference committee to consider the |
---|
41 | | - | differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the |
---|
42 | | - | conference committee report on H.J.R. No. 34 on May 26, 2019, by the |
---|
43 | | - | following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.J.R. No. 34 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
49 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
50 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.J.R. |
---|
51 | | - | No. 34 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | RECEIVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Secretary of State |
---|
| 35 | + | * * * * * |
---|