|
05/24/2019
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Postponed 5/20/19 1:30 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 West
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Record vote RV#1243
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|