House | 04/23/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SJR 24 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2019 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 12/21/2018 | Filed |