Senate | 05/22/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Record vote RV#344 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Amended 1-Capriglione | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Filed |