Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR57 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/28/2019

                            86R5255 BEF-D
 By: Hinojosa H.J.R. No. 57


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to set the salaries of members
 of the legislature and the lieutenant governor based on the average
 public school teacher salary in this state.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 24(a) and (c), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Members of the Legislature shall receive from the Public
 Treasury a salary in an amount determined [of Six Hundred Dollars
 ($600) per month, unless a greater amount is recommended] by the
 Texas Ethics Commission under Section 24a(g) of this article [and
 approved by the voters of this State in which case the salary is
 that amount. Each member shall also receive a per diem set by the
 Texas Ethics Commission for each day during each Regular and
 Special Session of the Legislature].
 (c)  In addition to a salary [the per diem] the Members of
 each House shall be entitled to mileage at the same rate as
 prescribed by law for employees of the State of Texas.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24a, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission shall set the annual salary of the
 members of the legislature, including the speaker of the house of
 representatives, in an amount equal to the average salary paid to a
 full-time certified classroom teacher in the public free schools of
 this state for the preceding school year as determined by the
 commission from available information and shall establish the date
 on which the annual change in salary takes effect each year.
 SECTION 3.  Section 28, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.  The Legislature shall, at its first regular
 session after the publication of each United States decennial
 census, apportion the state into senatorial and representative
 districts, agreeable to the provisions of Sections 25 and 26 of this
 Article. In the event the Legislature shall at any such first
 regular session following the publication of a United States
 decennial census, fail to make such apportionment, same shall be
 done by the Legislative Redistricting Board of Texas, which is
 hereby created, and shall be composed of five (5) members, as
 follows: The Lieutenant Governor, the Speaker of the House of
 Representatives, the Attorney General, the Comptroller of Public
 Accounts and the Commissioner of the General Land Office, a
 majority of whom shall constitute a quorum. Said Board shall
 assemble in the City of Austin within ninety (90) days after the
 final adjournment of such regular session. The Board shall, within
 sixty (60) days after assembling, apportion the state into
 senatorial and representative districts, or into senatorial or
 representative districts, as the failure of action of such
 Legislature may make necessary. Such apportionment shall be in
 writing and signed by three (3) or more of the members of the Board
 duly acknowledged as the act and deed of such Board, and, when so
 executed and filed with the Secretary of State, shall have force and
 effect of law. Such apportionment shall become effective at the
 next succeeding statewide general election. The Supreme Court of
 Texas shall have jurisdiction to compel such Board to perform its
 duties in accordance with the provisions of this section by writ of
 mandamus or other extraordinary writs conformable to the usages of
 law. The Legislature shall provide necessary funds for clerical
 and technical aid and for other expenses incidental to the work of
 the Board, and the Lieutenant Governor and the Speaker of the House
 of Representatives shall be entitled to receive [per diem and]
 travel expense during the Board's session in the same manner and
 amount as they would receive while attending a special session of
 the Legislature.
 SECTION 4.  Section 17(b), Article IV, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The Lieutenant Governor shall, while acting as
 President of the Senate, receive for his or her services the same
 compensation and mileage which shall be allowed to the members of
 the Senate[, and no more unless the Texas Ethics Commission
 recommends and the voters approve a higher salary, in which case the
 salary is that amount]; and during the time the Lieutenant Governor
 exercises the powers and authority appertaining to the office of
 Governor, the Lieutenant Governor shall receive in like manner the
 same compensation which the Governor would have received had the
 Governor been employed in the duties of that office, and no more.
 An increase in the emoluments of the office of Lieutenant Governor
 does not make a member of the Legislature ineligible to serve in the
 office of Lieutenant Governor.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 24a(e) and (f), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, are repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies to
 the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, setting the salaries of members of the
 legislature and the lieutenant governor based on the average public
 school teacher salary in this state.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsections (c) and (d)
 of this temporary provision, the amendments to Sections 24, 24a,
 and 28, Article III, and Section 17, Article IV, of this
 constitution take effect September 1, 2020, and apply to salaries
 on and after that date.
 (c)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (d) of this
 temporary provision, Section 24a(g), Article III, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2020, and applies to salaries
 on and after September 1, 2020.
 (d)  The constitutional amendment described by Subsection
 (a) of this temporary provision does not apply to an individual who
 was a member of the legislature, including the speaker of the house
 of representatives, or the lieutenant governor during all or part
 of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019. The salary and per
 diem for any future service as a member of the legislature, as the
 speaker of the house of representatives, or as the lieutenant
 governor, including service on the Legislative Redistricting Board
 of Texas, by an individual to whom this subsection applies shall be
 determined in accordance with Sections 24, 24a, and 28, Article
 III, and Section 17, Article IV, of this constitution, as those
 provisions existed on November 4, 2019.
 SECTION 7.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment setting the salaries of
 members of the legislature and the lieutenant governor based on the
 average public school teacher salary in this state."