Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Record vote RV#943
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|