House | 04/17/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2019 | Filed |