Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1118 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    H.R. No. 1118


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, U.S. Border Patrol Agent Javier Vega Jr. tragically
 died in the line of duty on August 3, 2014, at the age of 36, and his
 untimely death left a deep void in the lives of all who were
 privileged to know this heroic officer; and
 WHEREAS, Born on June 17, 1978, in La Feria to Javier and
 Marie Vega, Javier Vega Jr. grew up with the companionship of a
 brother, Jordy; he was an alumnus of La Feria High School, where he
 played football and excelled at his studies, and he went on to
 proudly serve his country as a member of the U.S. Marine Corps;
 after leaving the military, he began a law enforcement career with
 the U.S. Border Patrol on February 11, 2008; assigned as a K-9
 handler at the Kingsville Station, he was passionate about his work
 and enjoyed the bond of camaraderie he shared with his K-9 partner,
 Goldie; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family, Javier Vega was
 blessed with a loving wife, Andrea Brown Vega, and three sons,
 Javier, Jiovanni, and Jarod; he enjoyed spending time with his
 family and also counted running and fishing among his favorite
 activities; he was known as a man of great kindness who was always
 willing to help out a friend or stranger in need; on March 20, 2019,
 the U.S. Border Patrol honored Agent Vega by rededicating the
 Sarita Checkpoint in his name; and
 WHEREAS, Javier Vega rendered exemplary service to his
 country, his state, and his community, and the commitment and
 bravery that he demonstrated, both in the daily fulfillment of his
 duties and in the final moments of his life, will never be
 forgotten; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Javier Vega Jr. and
 extend heartfelt sympathy to his family, friends, and former
 colleagues; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Javier Vega
 Jr.
 Lucio III
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1118 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 18, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House