Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1118 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 1118
1+86R22269 BK-D
2+ By: Lucio III H.R. No. 1118
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, U.S. Border Patrol Agent Javier Vega Jr. tragically
67 died in the line of duty on August 3, 2014, at the age of 36, and his
78 untimely death left a deep void in the lives of all who were
89 privileged to know this heroic officer; and
910 WHEREAS, Born on June 17, 1978, in La Feria to Javier and
1011 Marie Vega, Javier Vega Jr. grew up with the companionship of a
1112 brother, Jordy; he was an alumnus of La Feria High School, where he
1213 played football and excelled at his studies, and he went on to
1314 proudly serve his country as a member of the U.S. Marine Corps;
1415 after leaving the military, he began a law enforcement career with
1516 the U.S. Border Patrol on February 11, 2008; assigned as a K-9
1617 handler at the Kingsville Station, he was passionate about his work
1718 and enjoyed the bond of camaraderie he shared with his K-9 partner,
1819 Goldie; and
1920 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family, Javier Vega was
2021 blessed with a loving wife, Andrea Brown Vega, and three sons,
2122 Javier, Jiovanni, and Jarod; he enjoyed spending time with his
2223 family and also counted running and fishing among his favorite
2324 activities; he was known as a man of great kindness who was always
2425 willing to help out a friend or stranger in need; on March 20, 2019,
2526 the U.S. Border Patrol honored Agent Vega by rededicating the
2627 Sarita Checkpoint in his name; and
2728 WHEREAS, Javier Vega rendered exemplary service to his
2829 country, his state, and his community, and the commitment and
2930 bravery that he demonstrated, both in the daily fulfillment of his
3031 duties and in the final moments of his life, will never be
3132 forgotten; now, therefore, be it
3233 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
3334 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Javier Vega Jr. and
3435 extend heartfelt sympathy to his family, friends, and former
3536 colleagues; and, be it further
3637 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
3738 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
3839 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Javier Vega
3940 Jr.
40- Lucio III
41- ______________________________
42- Speaker of the House
43- I certify that H.R. No. 1118 was unanimously adopted by a
44- rising vote of the House on April 18, 2019.
45- ______________________________
46- Chief Clerk of the House