House | 04/24/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Filed |