Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR156 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/08/2019

                            H.R. No. 156


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The untimely death of Carl D. Kuhle of Bogata on
 December 11, 2018, at the age of 60, has brought a tremendous loss
 to his loving family and friends; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Walter and Faye Miller Kuhle, Carl Kuhle
 was born in Clarksville on August 13, 1958; he learned the value of
 hard work at a young age and went on to work as a material handler
 supervisor for the Kimberly-Clark Corporation for more than 30
 years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Kuhle married the former Martha Martin on
 February 15, 1980, and during the nearly four decades they shared,
 they raised two daughters, April and Ashley, and delighted in
 welcoming seven grandchildren, Blake, Braden, Kamden, Madilyn,
 Braden, Caydon, and Lyric, into their family; in addition to
 spending time with his loved ones, Mr. Kuhle enjoyed motorcycling,
 boating, and visiting restaurants around town; and
 WHEREAS, Carl Kuhle was a kind and caring gentleman with a
 wonderful sense of humor, and although his passing has greatly
 saddened all those who were privileged to know him, they will
 forever treasure their memories of the happy times they spent in his
 company; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Carl D. Kuhle and
 extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Martha Kuhle; to his daughters, April Wilhite and her
 husband, Brad, and Ashley Coffman and her husband, Bobby; to his
 grandchildren, Blake and Braden Giles, Kamden and Madilyn Jeffrey,
 Braden Wilhite, and Caydon and Lyric Coffman; to his brother, Clay
 Booth; to his sister, Shelia Dean; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Carl Kuhle.
 VanDeaver
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 156 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House