House | 04/11/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Record vote RV#230 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 11/14/2018 | Filed |