Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2169 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2019

                            H.R. No. 2169


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, On May 16, 2020, Americans are paying special
 tribute to our nation's military personnel with the commemoration
 of Armed Forces Day; and
 WHEREAS, This annual observance was launched following the
 1947 merger of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the
 National Military Establishment, now known as the Department of
 Defense; on this occasion, we pause to honor the members of the U.S.
 Army, Navy, Marines, Air Force, and Coast Guard, whose devotion to
 duty has helped safeguard Americans at home and abroad; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Army began as 10 companies of riflemen that
 were sanctioned by the Second Continental Congress on June 14,
 1775; since that time, the army has supplied the majority of
 American ground troops when our nation has taken up arms; today, the
 service is composed of a number of divisions, including Infantry,
 Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of Engineers, and
 Special Forces, as well as such specialized branches as the Army
 Medical Department Corps, Chaplain Corps, and Judge Advocate
 General's Corps; and
 WHEREAS, The foundation for the U.S. Navy was first laid on
 October 13, 1775, when the Second Continental Congress authorized
 the outfitting of two warships; following the Revolutionary War,
 the service remained dormant until the establishment of the
 Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798; today, naval personnel
 protect the homeland by sea and provide seaborne support to the
 other military branches; and
 WHEREAS, On November 10, 1775, the Second Continental
 Congress passed a resolution to assemble two marine battalions, and
 though the Marine Corps disbanded after the War of Independence, it
 was reestablished on July 11, 1798; the service is now a component
 of the Department of the Navy, with the mission of preparing for
 counterinsurgency, amphibious warfare, and commando operations;
 and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force traces its roots back to the 1907
 creation of an aeronautical division within the U.S. Army Signal
 Corps, and it later became known as the Army Air Corps and the Army
 Air Forces before being designated as an individual branch within
 the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947; the service first
 proved its tremendous worth by performing crucial reconnaissance
 and bombing missions throughout World War I and World War II, and it
 quickly earned recognition as the most powerful air force on earth;
 the branch's scope has expanded dramatically over the years, and it
 now encompasses defense in the realms of air, space, and
 cyberspace; and
 WHEREAS, Founded in 1915, the U.S. Coast Guard is now part of
 the Department of Homeland Security; throughout its history, the
 branch has assumed many duties, from protecting against pirates to
 intercepting contraband, conducting search and rescue operations,
 responding to oil spills, and licensing and certifying all U.S.
 maritime personnel; during wartime, its efforts have included
 escort and patrol duty and assisting amphibious landings; and
 WHEREAS, From the infancy of our nation onward, American
 military personnel have been integral to preserving the security
 and liberty of our citizenry; this occasion provides a fitting
 opportunity to express our deepest gratitude to all active-duty
 servicemen and servicewomen, as well as to the members of the
 reserve forces, the Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard
 for their gallantry and dedication; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby recognize May 16, 2020, as Armed Forces Day and
 pay tribute to the members of the nation's military.
 Price
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2169 was adopted by the House on May
 27, 2019, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House