Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2209 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2019

                            H.R. No. 2209


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, On June 6, 2019, Americans and freedom-loving people
 from around the globe will pause to reflect, honor, and commemorate
 the 75th anniversary of the D-Day invasion by principally American,
 British, and Canadian military troops by amphibious assault from
 the English Channel on the beaches of Normandy, France, and via
 airborne assault in the French countryside by their fellow
 paratroopers, totaling nearly 160,000 men, this military campaign
 code-named "Operation Overlord" significantly led to the ultimate
 liberation of Europe and the end of World War II; and
 WHEREAS, Though Germany's Third Reich was suffering heavy
 military losses on the Eastern Front, it still controlled much of
 Europe; after entering the war in December 1941, U.S. armed forces
 joined with other Allied forces to drive the German Africa Corps out
 of North Africa in May 1943, and in July of that year, the American
 and British forces began the liberation of Europe with the invasion
 of Sicily; by the summer of 1944, World War II had been raging for
 nearly five years; and
 WHEREAS, Planning for an Allied invasion across the English
 Channel subsequently commenced, and in January 1944, General Dwight
 D. Eisenhower was appointed as commander of Operation Overlord;
 faced with a 2,400-mile German defensive line of bunkers, land
 mines, and beach obstacles known as the Atlantic Wall, the Allies
 began to train a force of American, British, and Canadian troops in
 Britain; and
 WHEREAS, In the months leading up to the invasion, the
 British and American air forces flew 200,000 sorties and dropped
 195,000 tons of bombs on German installations in France, attacking
 rail centers, airfields, military bases, radar stations, and
 coastal artillery batteries; the Allies also engaged in an
 extensive deception operation intended to fool the Germans into
 thinking the invasion would take place near Pas-de-Calais, instead
 of the real target, the coast of Normandy; and
 WHEREAS, Late in the day of June 5, 1944, almost 6,000 ships
 and landing craft loaded with troops and supplies left Britain and
 started across the English Channel toward France; that night,
 approximately 800 aircraft carrying paratroopers and towing
 gliders dropped members of the American 82nd and 101st Airborne
 Divisions and the British 6th Airborne Division behind enemy lines
 in Normandy; and
 WHEREAS, At 6:30 a.m. on June 6, 1944, the first of 156,000
 Allied troops landed on the shores of Normandy; the soldiers at the
 beachheads of Gold, Juno, Sword, and Utah met light German
 resistance, but at Omaha Beach, the U.S. 1st Division encountered
 strong Wehrmacht defenses; the Americans fought for every inch of
 ground, suffering more than 2,000 casualties before finally seizing
 control and taking the beach; and
 WHEREAS, A week later, the coast was completely under Allied
 command, and over 326,000 troops, 50,000 vehicles, and 100,000 tons
 of equipment had been landed; by the end of August 1944, the Allies
 had liberated Paris and driven the Germans out of northwestern
 France; there was much hard fighting to come as the Allies advanced
 east into Germany, but less than a year after D-Day, on May 8, 1945,
 the Allies accepted the unconditional surrender of Nazi Germany;
 and
 WHEREAS, One of the greatest military feats in history, the
 Normandy invasion is a testament to the bold leadership and
 logistical skill of General Eisenhower and the Allied command, but
 in the end, the success of the operation relied heavily on the
 determination and courage of the troops who waded through the surf
 into a hail of machine gun bullets, who rode gliders in the dark
 through bursts of antiaircraft fire, and who parachuted into the
 French countryside occupied by the enemy; and
 WHEREAS, The heroism and sacrifice of these soldiers, airmen,
 and sailors were essential in liberating a continent and ending one
 of the most brutal dictatorships of the 20th century, and
 succeeding generations owe them a debt of gratitude that time can
 never erase; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby commemorate the 75th anniversary of the D-Day
 invasion and pay tribute to the veterans who participated and to
 those who lost their lives.
 Price
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2209 was adopted by the House on May
 27, 2019, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House