Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2210 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 2210
1+86R37262 ST-D
2+ By: Price H.R. No. 2210
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, On July 20, 2019, people in Texas, across the
67 nation, and around the world will celebrate the 50th anniversary of
78 the historic Apollo 11 moon landing in 1969, and this occasion
89 provides a fitting opportunity to pay tribute to the creation of
910 NASA and to all 17 missions of the Apollo program; and
1011 WHEREAS, Because our nation had fallen behind Europe in
1112 aircraft technology by the start of World War I in 1914, Congress
1213 created the National Advisory Committee for Aeronautics in March
1314 1915, and for the next four decades, NACA conducted aeronautical
1415 research that directly influenced the successful growth of the
1516 American aerospace industry; by the 1950s, NACA engineers were
1617 already thinking about the technology necessary to send men into
1718 space, including a worldwide tracking network, dual controls to
1819 give pilots greater autonomy over their craft, and heat shields for
1920 reentry into the atmosphere; and
2021 WHEREAS, Despite these efforts, the Soviet Union was first
2122 into space, launching the Sputnik satellite in 1957; in response,
2223 our nation built on the earlier work of NACA and created the
2324 National Aeronautics and Space Administration, which opened for
2425 business on October 1, 1958; NASA scrambled to quickly get the
2526 U.S. space program up to speed, and the urgency of the situation was
2627 made clear on April 12, 1961, when a Soviet astronaut became both
2728 the first man in space and the first man to orbit the Earth; less
2829 than a month later, Alan Shepard became the first American in space
2930 during a short suborbital flight on May 5, 1961; and
3031 WHEREAS, With the U.S. under tremendous pressure to catch and
3132 overtake the Soviet Union in the "space race," President John
3233 F. Kennedy sought a boldly ambitious project; he addressed a
3334 special joint session of Congress on May 25, 1961, declaring that
3435 "this nation should commit itself to achieving the goal, before
3536 this decade is out, of landing a man on the moon and returning him
3637 safely to Earth"; and
3738 WHEREAS, President Kennedy expanded on this declaration in a
3839 famous speech at Rice University in Houston on September 12, 1962,
3940 when he stated, "this State of Texas, this country of the United
4041 States was not built by those who waited and rested and wished to
4142 look behind them. This country was conquered by those who moved
4243 forward--and so will space. . . . But why, some say, the moon? Why
4344 choose this as our goal? And they may well ask why climb the highest
4445 mountain? Why, 35 years ago, fly the Atlantic? Why does Rice play
4546 Texas? We choose to go to the moon. We choose to go to the moon in
4647 this decade and do the other things, not because they are easy, but
4748 because they are hard"; and
4849 WHEREAS, Building on the success of NASA's first two manned
4950 spaceflight programs, Mercury and Gemini, the scientists,
5051 engineers, and technicians of the Apollo program began to develop
5152 and build the necessary technology to carry out the lunar mission
5253 and to train the brave astronauts who would make the journey; much
5354 of the training was based at what is now the Johnson Space Center in
5455 Houston, which was also the home of the NASA mission control center;
5556 and
5657 WHEREAS, The dangers inherent in spaceflight were lost on no
5758 one, and they became all the more apparent when the first scheduled
5859 manned mission, Apollo 1, ended in tragedy; astronauts Virgil "Gus"
5960 Grissom, Edward White, and Roger Chaffee were killed in a fire
6061 during a training simulation on the launch pad on January 27, 1967;
6162 the disaster caused NASA to reevaluate all aspects of the
6263 spacecraft and the program, but the Apollo administrators,
6364 technicians, and astronauts quickly rallied; between October 1968
6465 and May 1969, four manned missions were successfully completed to
6566 conduct various trial runs in space, and the flight of Apollo 8
6667 during Christmas 1968 became the first manned flight to orbit the
6768 moon and return to Earth; and
6869 WHEREAS, On July 16, 1969, the astronauts Neil Armstrong,
6970 Buzz Aldrin, and Michael Collins of Apollo 11 lifted off from the
7071 Kennedy Space Center aboard a Saturn V rocket; after traveling
7172 240,000 miles through space, the conjoined Apollo command module
7273 and the lunar lander, dubbed "the Eagle," went into orbit around the
7374 moon on July 19; the following day, Armstrong and Aldrin left
7475 Collins behind in the command module, entered the lander, and
7576 descended toward the lunar surface; with only 30 seconds of fuel
7677 remaining, Armstrong set the spacecraft down on the Sea of
7778 Tranquility and coolly radioed the astronauts' status to mission
7879 control: "Houston, Tranquility Base here, the Eagle has landed";
7980 and
8081 WHEREAS, Six and a half hours later, as a television camera
8182 beamed his image back to hundreds of millions of viewers on Earth,
8283 Neil Armstrong became the first human being to set foot on the moon,
8384 making his famous pronouncement, "That's one small step for man,
8485 one giant leap for mankind"; Aldrin followed a few minutes later,
8586 and together the two astronauts spent two and a half hours on the
8687 lunar surface, taking photographs, collecting samples, and
8788 planting an American flag; the following day, they returned to
8889 their colleague in the command module, and on July 24, the three men
8990 returned safely to Earth; and
9091 WHEREAS, Following the triumph of the first lunar landing,
9192 Americans returned to the moon six more times; one of the missions,
9293 Apollo 13, became known as a "successful failure" when, after an
9394 explosion on board crippled the command module, the ingenious
9495 improvisation of engineers on the ground and the bravery and
9596 determination of the crew allowed the astronauts to return safely
9697 to Earth; in all, the United States landed 12 men on the moon
9798 between the flights of Apollo 11 in July 1969 and Apollo 17 in
9899 December 1972; nearly 60 years after President Kennedy's address to
99100 Congress, the Russians have yet to land a single cosmonaut on the
100101 moon; and
101102 WHEREAS, Between October 2018 and December 2022, NASA is
102103 marking the 50th anniversaries of the Apollo flights, and the
103104 official logo of these milestone anniversaries depicts the arc of
104105 Earth's horizon striking through the word Apollo against a star
105106 field that recalls the collective effort of the 400,000 people who
106107 worked on the program; three central stars symbolize the sacrifice
107108 of the Apollo 1 astronauts, Grissom, White, and Chaffee; behind the
108109 star field is a blue nebula that stands for NASA's bold plans for
109110 the next half century of American space exploration, including a
110111 return to the moon and manned missions to Mars; and
111112 WHEREAS, The 17 missions of the Apollo program represent one
112113 of the greatest scientific and engineering feats in history, and
113114 they remain a testament to human imagination and ingenuity and to
114115 the pioneering spirit of a great nation; now, therefore, be it
115116 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
116117 Legislature hereby commemorate the 17 missions of the Apollo
117118 program on the occasion of the 50th anniversary of the first moon
118119 landing in July 2019.
119- Price
120- ______________________________
121- Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.R. No. 2210 was adopted by the House on May
123- 27, 2019, by a non-record vote.
124- ______________________________
125- Chief Clerk of the House