House | 03/12/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Filed |