Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR579 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/15/2019

                    H.R. No. 579


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Robert G. Packard of Waco, an esteemed educator and
 a central figure in his community, passed away on January 5, 2019,
 at the age of 94; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Regina, New Mexico, on August 13, 1924,
 Robert Packard graduated from Temple High School in 1943, and he
 served with the U.S. Army Signal Corps during World War II;
 following his military tenure, he earned bachelor of science,
 master of arts, and doctoral degrees in physics from The University
 of Texas at Austin, and in 1952, he was named an associate professor
 of physics at Baylor University; he met his future wife, the former
 Joyce Hornaday, on the Waco campus, and the couple, who married on
 April 15, 1954, went on to share a rewarding union of 64 years; and
 WHEREAS, Enjoying a distinguished career at Baylor spanning
 nearly six decades, Dr. Packard received the highest honor granted
 to the university's faculty members, a master teacher designation,
 and his classroom in the Marrs McLean Science Building was renamed
 the Robert G. Packard Lecture Hall; renowned for his popular
 introductory physics course, this beloved professor returned in
 2009 to teach the class for one semester after having retired in
 2002; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Packard achieved professor emeritus of physics
 status and was the recipient of the university's W. R. White
 Meritorious, Collins Outstanding Professor, and Baylor Legacy
 Mentor Awards, among others; he was also named an Outstanding
 Educator of America, and the Robert G. and Joyce Hornaday Packard
 Endowed Scholars Fund was established in honor of Dr. Packard and
 his wife, a former assistant dean of women at Baylor; moreover, he
 worked tirelessly in behalf of his fellow citizens, holding
 numerous volunteer leadership roles; and
 WHEREAS, Robert Packard earned the admiration of all who knew
 him, inspiring generations of students with his creative teaching
 methods, and he leaves behind a legacy that will resonate at Baylor
 University and in the Waco community for years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Robert G. Packard
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Joyce Packard; to his brothers, Charles, Wayne, and
 I. B. Packard; to his nieces and nephews; and to his other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Robert
 Packard.
 Leach
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 579 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 13, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House