Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR816 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/20/2019

                    H.R. No. 816


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Dr. Baker Pattillo of Nacogdoches on
 December 29, 2018, at the age of 75, brought great sorrow to his
 family and friends, as well as to the campus community of Stephen
 F. Austin State University, which he served with great distinction
 for more than five decades; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Camden on June 22, 1943, Baker Pattillo was
 the son of the Reverend Leroy Pattillo and Mauree Pattillo; he moved
 with his family to Arp in 1956 and lettered as a member of the Tigers
 football team at Arp High School, where his classmates voted him
 "most likely to succeed"; he subsequently put himself through
 college, and after studying first at Tyler Junior College, he
 earned his bachelor's degree in 1965 and his master's degree in
 guidance and counseling in 1966 from SFA; he later completed a
 Ph.D. in educational administration at Texas A&M University; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Pattillo was hired as assistant director of
 placement and financial aid at SFA in 1966; he was promoted to dean
 of student services in 1972 and to vice president for student
 affairs in 1979; after being appointed interim president in July
 2006, he assumed the office of president in January 2007; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of his 11-year tenure as president,
 Dr. Pattillo coordinated campus projects that totaled more than
 $425 million, including a student recreation center, a nursing
 building, and three residential buildings; moreover, he took
 well-deserved pride in securing $150 million in funding for four
 additional facilities during his last day of work; under his
 leadership, the university exceeded 13,000 in enrollment,
 surpassing its previous record, and Dr. Pattillo enjoyed a strong
 rapport with students, as well as with faculty, staff, regents, and
 state and national leaders; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Pattillo shared 52 years of marriage with his
 wife, Janice Pattillo, whom he wed on December 17, 1966, and they
 were blessed with a daughter, Paige, a grandson, Jackson, and a
 son-in-law, Todd; and
 WHEREAS, Through his vision and leadership, Dr. Baker
 Pattillo contributed immeasurably to advancing the mission of
 Stephen F. Austin State University, and he leaves behind a legacy
 that will continue to resonate for years to come; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Dr. Baker Pattillo
 and extend deepest condolences to his relatives and many friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dr. Baker
 Pattillo.
 Clardy
 Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble
Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble
 Allen Guillen Oliverson Allen Guillen Oliverson
Allen Guillen Oliverson
 Allison Gutierrez Ortega Allison Gutierrez Ortega
Allison Gutierrez Ortega
 Anchia Harless Pacheco Anchia Harless Pacheco
Anchia Harless Pacheco
 Anderson Harris Paddie Anderson Harris Paddie
Anderson Harris Paddie
 Ashby Hefner Parker Ashby Hefner Parker
Ashby Hefner Parker
 Bailes Hernandez Patterson Bailes Hernandez Patterson
Bailes Hernandez Patterson
 Beckley Herrero Paul Beckley Herrero Paul
Beckley Herrero Paul
 Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez
Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez
 Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan
Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan
 Bernal Howard Price Bernal Howard Price
Bernal Howard Price
 Biedermann Huberty Ramos Biedermann Huberty Ramos
Biedermann Huberty Ramos
 Blanco Hunter Raney Blanco Hunter Raney
Blanco Hunter Raney
 Bohac Israel Raymond Bohac Israel Raymond
Bohac Israel Raymond
 Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds
Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds
 Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez
 Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr. Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.
Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.
 Bucy Kacal Rose Bucy Kacal Rose
Bucy Kacal Rose
 Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal
Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal
 Burrows King of Parker Sanford Burrows King of Parker Sanford
Burrows King of Parker Sanford
 Button King of Uvalde Schaefer Button King of Uvalde Schaefer
Button King of Uvalde Schaefer
 Cain Klick Shaheen Cain Klick Shaheen
Cain Klick Shaheen
 Calanni Krause Sheffield Calanni Krause Sheffield
Calanni Krause Sheffield
 Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr. Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.
Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.
 Capriglione Lambert Shine Capriglione Lambert Shine
Capriglione Lambert Shine
 Clardy Landgraf Smith Clardy Landgraf Smith
Clardy Landgraf Smith
 Cole Lang Smithee Cole Lang Smithee
Cole Lang Smithee
 Coleman Larson Springer Coleman Larson Springer
Coleman Larson Springer
 Collier Leach Stephenson Collier Leach Stephenson
Collier Leach Stephenson
 Cortez Leman Stickland Cortez Leman Stickland
Cortez Leman Stickland
 Craddick Longoria Stucky Craddick Longoria Stucky
Craddick Longoria Stucky
 Cyrier Lopez Swanson Cyrier Lopez Swanson
Cyrier Lopez Swanson
 Darby Lozano Talarico Darby Lozano Talarico
Darby Lozano Talarico
 Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry
Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry
 Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria
 Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris
 Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt
Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt
 Dominguez Meyer Toth Dominguez Meyer Toth
Dominguez Meyer Toth
 Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas
Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas
 Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant
Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant
 Fierro Miller VanDeaver Fierro Miller VanDeaver
Fierro Miller VanDeaver
 Flynn Minjarez Vo Flynn Minjarez Vo
Flynn Minjarez Vo
 Frank Moody Walle Frank Moody Walle
Frank Moody Walle
 Frullo Morales White Frullo Morales White
Frullo Morales White
 Geren Morrison Wilson Geren Morrison Wilson
Geren Morrison Wilson
 Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray
Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray
 Goldman Murphy Wu Goldman Murphy Wu
Goldman Murphy Wu
 González of Dallas Murr Zedler González of Dallas Murr Zedler
González of Dallas Murr Zedler
 González of El Paso Neave Zerwas González of El Paso Neave Zerwas
González of El Paso Neave Zerwas
 Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener
Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 816 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 19, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Bonnen of Brazoria Guerra Noble

Allen Guillen Oliverson

Allison Gutierrez Ortega

Anchia Harless Pacheco

Anderson Harris Paddie

Ashby Hefner Parker

Bailes Hernandez Patterson

Beckley Herrero Paul

Bell of Kaufman Hinojosa Perez

Bell of Montgomery Holland Phelan

Bernal Howard Price

Biedermann Huberty Ramos

Blanco Hunter Raney

Bohac Israel Raymond

Bonnen of Galveston E. Johnson of Dallas Reynolds

Bowers J. Johnson of Dallas Rodriguez

Buckley Johnson of Harris Romero, Jr.

Bucy Kacal Rose

Burns King of Hemphill Rosenthal

Burrows King of Parker Sanford

Button King of Uvalde Schaefer

Cain Klick Shaheen

Calanni Krause Sheffield

Canales Kuempel Sherman, Sr.

Capriglione Lambert Shine

Clardy Landgraf Smith

Cole Lang Smithee

Coleman Larson Springer

Collier Leach Stephenson

Cortez Leman Stickland

Craddick Longoria Stucky

Cyrier Lopez Swanson

Darby Lozano Talarico

Davis of Dallas Lucio III Thierry

Davis of Harris Martinez Thompson of Brazoria

Dean Martinez Fischer Thompson of Harris

Deshotel Metcalf Tinderholt

Dominguez Meyer Toth

Dutton Meza Turner of Dallas

Farrar Middleton Turner of Tarrant

Fierro Miller VanDeaver

Flynn Minjarez Vo

Frank Moody Walle

Frullo Morales White

Geren Morrison Wilson

Gervin-Hawkins Muñoz, Jr. Wray

Goldman Murphy Wu

González of Dallas Murr Zedler

González of El Paso Neave Zerwas

Goodwin Nevárez Zwiener