Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1014 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/01/2019

                            By: Perry S.B. No. 1014
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to facilities of the hospital system of the Reagan
 Hospital District of Reagan County, Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1088.104, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  The hospital system may include:
 (1)  facilities for domiciliary care of the sick,
 injured, or geriatric;
 (2)  outpatient clinics;
 (3)  dispensaries;
 (4)  convalescent home facilities;
 (5)  necessary nurses;
 (6)  domiciliaries and training centers;
 (7)  blood banks;
 (8)  community mental health centers;
 (9)  research centers or laboratories; and
 (10)  any other facilities the board considers
 necessary for medical care, [and] hospital care, and public safety
 and health.
 (d)  A facility for public safety and health described by
 Subsection (c)(10) may only be:
 (1)  constructed by the district using private money;
 and
 (2)  used by the district, or any governmental entity
 to which the district leases the facility, for public safety and
 health purposes.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *